EP1111174 - Braking device for swivelling wing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 48291 Telgte / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31 D-48291 Telgte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berning, Renate Ladbergener Strasse 20 48346 Ostbevern / DE | [2001/26] | Application number, filing date | 00124771.7 | 14.11.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999160117 | 14.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19960117 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111174 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111174 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/28, E05D15/30 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
E05C17/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bremseinrichtung für einen schwenkbaren Flügel | [2001/26] | English: | Braking device for swivelling wing | [2001/26] | French: | Dispositif de freinage pour battant pivotant | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.07.2005 | GB | 20.07.2005 | IE | 20.07.2005 | IT | 20.07.2005 | TR | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | ES | 31.10.2005 | CY | 14.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GB | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
CY | 14.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GB | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GB | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GB | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
TR | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GB | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GB | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
IE | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.07.2005 | |
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 20.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7721102U (WILH. FRANK GMBH) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8903520U (WILH. SCHLECHTENDAHL & SÖHNE GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YA]DE4436271 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-5,9 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 56; figure 3 * [A] 6-8; | [A]DE19717116 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [YA]GB2334749 (TROJAN HARDWARE & DESIGNS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-5,9 * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 21 * [A] 6-8 |