EP1130368 - Measuring device with cord level detector and method for shortening the cord [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2010/33] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co.KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Robert Altweg 31 79585 Steinen / DE | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125655.1 | 23.11.2000 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | DE20001009067 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10009067 | [2001/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130368 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130368 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130368 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G01F23/268 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49004 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49815 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53274 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | G01F23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/23] |
Former [2001/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Messgerät mit Seilsonde und Verfahren zum Kürzen der Seilsonde | [2001/36] | English: | Measuring device with cord level detector and method for shortening the cord | [2001/36] | French: | Dispositif de mesure à détecteur suspendu à une ligne et procédé pour raccourcir la ligne | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 23.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.08.2010 | [2011/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9103122U (GDT SOFTWARE) [A] 1,10 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29518916U (KLAUS FISCHER MES UND REGELTEC [DE]) [A] 1,10* page 6, line 7 - page 8, line 11; figure . *; | [A]EP0857954 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 12 - column 6, line 52; figures 1-3 * |