EP1110856 - Drive unit for motor-assisted bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2007/34] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yahagi, Kunio K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Toriyama, Masayuki K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Igarashi, Masashi K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Cho, Toshiyuki K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Sakagami, Koji K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 06 /
Akiba, Ryuji K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00125916.7 | 27.11.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19990365284 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36528499 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110856 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110856 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110856 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B62M6/55 (EP);
B62M6/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [2005/19] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hilfsantrieb für Fahrräder | [2001/26] | English: | Drive unit for motor-assisted bicycle | [2001/26] | French: | Bicyclette à assistance motorisée | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10250673 ; | [A]EP0881141 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 14 - line 17 * * column 7, line 28 - line 30; figures 3-8 *; | [XA]DE19848602 (SUZUKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 42 - line 50; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [PX]EP0968911 (RIZZETTO CIPRIANO [IT]) [PX] 1,2 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10250673 A 19980922 (MORIYAMA KOGYO KK; YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH10250673 |