EP1208782 - Percolation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoakim, Alfred Ch. de la Routiaz 2 1806 St-Legier-la-Chiesaz / CH | 02 /
Masek, Petr Le Verger C 1614 Granges / CH | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Borne, Patrice Daniel, et al Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Borne, Patrice Daniel, et al Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2003/24] | Thomas, Alain 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2002/22] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 00125972.0 | 28.11.2000 | [2002/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208782 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1208782 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
A47J31/369 (EP,US);
A47J31/0647 (EP,US);
A47J31/0668 (EP,US);
A47J31/4467 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/08] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Perkolationsvorrichtung | [2002/22] | English: | Percolation device | [2002/22] | French: | Dispositif de percolation | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.08.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/48] | MC | 30.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2617389 (DESALTERA [FR], et al) [X] 6,7 * page 4, line 30 - page 8, line 31; figure - * [A] 1; | [Y]DE29915025U (KUPFNER FRANZ [AT]) [Y] 1,4 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [X]US6026732 (KOLLEP ALEXANDRE [CH], et al) [X] 6* column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]WO0064318 (CIE MEDITERRANEENNE DES CAFES [FR], et al) [X] 6 * page 7, line 14 - page 14, line 13; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 1,4 |