|
31.08.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.08.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
05.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.05.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |