EP1211738 - Vent plug for accumulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VB Autobatterie GmbH & Co. KGaA Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states VB Autobatterie GmbH & Co. KGaA. Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Accumulatorenwerke Hoppecke Carl Zoellner & Sohn GmbH & Co. KG Bontkirchener Strasse 2 59929 Brilon / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cramer, Wilhelm Am Heidfeld 1 59929 Brilon-Messinghausen / DE | 02 /
Hülscher, Manfred Dr. Stubbener Strasse 10a 27721 Ritterhude / DE | 03 /
Nann, Dr. Eberhard Schmückersweg 2 59494 Soest / DE | [2006/09] |
Former [2002/23] | 01 /
Cramer, Wilhelm Am Heidfeld 1 59929 Brilon-Mossinghausen / DE | ||
02 /
Hülscher, Manfred Dr. Stubbener Strasse 10a 27721 Ritterhude / DE | |||
03 /
Nann, Dr. Eberhard Schmückersweg 2 59494 Soest / DE | Representative(s) | Gramm, Werner GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Gramm, Werner, Prof. Dipl.-Ing. GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126039.7 | 29.11.2000 | [2002/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211738 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211738 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
H01M50/308 (EP,US);
H01M50/325 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] | Title | German: | Verschlussstopfenanordnung für Akkumulatoren | [2002/23] | English: | Vent plug for accumulators | [2002/23] | French: | Bouchon à évent pour accumulateurs | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IE | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 08.03.2006 | |
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4052534 (DEVITT JOHN L) [A] 1 * column 3, line 2 - line 20; figure 2 *; | [Y]US4328290 (SZYMBORSKI JOSEPH, et al) [Y] 1,2,6-8 * column 3, line 27 - line 45; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4032858 (DETA AKKUMULATOREN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0756338 (HAGEN BATTERIE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6-8 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-7; claims 1-3 * * column 6, line 27 - line 35 *; | [A]EP0920063 (HOPPECKE ZOELLNER SOHN ACCU [DE]) |