EP1106862 - Tight mounting of an air spring bellow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Luftfedersysteme GmbH Philipsbornstrasse 1 30165 Hannover / DE | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brakmann, Jörn Auf dem Dorn 21 30165 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Wenzel, Detlef Rommers Garten 8 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | 03 /
Hesberg, Ulrich, Dr. Dorfstrasse 2e 30916 Isernhagen / DE | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Egon Continental AG Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2001/24] | Application number, filing date | 00126336.7 | 02.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | DE1999159011 | 08.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19959011 | [2001/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1106862 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106862 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/05 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
F16F9/0454 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichte Befestigung eines Luftfederbalges | [2001/24] | English: | Tight mounting of an air spring bellow | [2001/24] | French: | Fixation étanche d'un soufflet roulant | [2001/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 18.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | CH | 31.12.2004 | LI | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
CH | 31.12.2004 | ||
LI | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5671907 (ARNOLD JOHN ERIC [US]) [A] 1* figure 2 * |