EP1085279 - Electromagnetic wave-activated sorption refrigeration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303-4900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfister, Dennis M. 1301 Dogwood Trail Conway, AR 72032 / US | 02 /
Byrd, Charles M. 39 West Julian 353 San Jose, California 95110 / US | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/12] | 01 /
Pfister, Dennis M. 1301 Dogwood Trail Conway, AR 72032 / US | ||
02 /
Byrd, Charles M. 400 Valencia No. 1222 Maumelle, AR 72113 / US | Representative(s) | Haines, Miles John L.S., et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Haines, Miles John, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00126617.0 | 20.03.1998 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | US19970821257 | 20.03.1997 Original published format: US 821257 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085279 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Classification | IPC: | F25B35/04, F25B49/04, H05B6/80 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
F25B49/046 (EP,US);
F25B17/08 (EP,US);
F25B35/04 (EP,US);
F25B39/026 (EP,US);
F25D23/12 (EP,US);
H05B6/701 (EP,US);
H05B6/802 (EP,US);
H05B6/808 (EP,US);
H05K7/20363 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Sorptionskältemaschine aktiviert durch elektromagnetische Wellen | [2001/12] | English: | Electromagnetic wave-activated sorption refrigeration system | [2001/12] | French: | Système de réfrigération par sorption activé par ondes électromagnétiques | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 22.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98911865.8 / EP0970333 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |