EP1182745 - Multipolar plug-in connection for electronic signal lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FILTEC GmbH Filtertechnologie für die Elektronikindustrie Ostenfeldmark 16 59557 Lippstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states FILTEC FILTERTECHNOLOGIE FUR DIE ELEKTRONIKINDUSTRIE GmbH Ostenfeldmark 16 D-59557 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dingenotto, Meinolf Brucknerweg 14 33758 Schloss Holte / DE | 02 /
Kühle, Jörg Hattropholser Strasse 14 59514 Welver-Borgeln / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Hans-Jochen, et al Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Strauss, H.-J., Dr., et al Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126652.7 | 05.12.2000 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | DE2000214791U | 26.08.2000 Original published format: DE 20014791 U | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182745 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182745 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182745 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/719, H01R12/16, H01R13/66 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
H01R13/7195 (EP,US);
H01R13/6625 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/09] | H01R13/719, H01R12/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [2003/40] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrpoliger Steckverbinder für elektronische Signalleitungen | [2002/09] | English: | Multipolar plug-in connection for electronic signal lines | [2002/09] | French: | Connexion enfichable multipolaire pour lignes de signaux électroniques | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 16.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 09.03.2005 | DK | 09.06.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | DK | 09.06.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8805218 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,6,12 * abstract * * page 5, line 7 - page 12, line 17 *; | [A]US5151054 (BRIONES FRANCISCO R [CA], et al) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 30 *; | [A]DE19501484 (THOMAS & BETTS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 10 *; | [A]EP0750370 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 7, line 40 * |