EP1118428 - Lathe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Index-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Hahn & Tessky Plochinger Strasse 92 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Index-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Hahn & Tessky Plochinger Strasse 92 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states INDEX-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG HAHN & TESSKY Plochinger Strasse 92 73730 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hafla, Dietmar Uhlandstrasse 12 73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE | 02 /
Haberkern, Anton, Dr. Bodelshofer Strasse 20 73240 Wendlingen / DE | 03 /
Gärtner, Michael Erlenstrasse 11 71691 Freiburg a.N. / DE | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126877.0 | 07.12.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | DE1999159961 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19959961 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118428 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118428 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118428 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1118428 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q41/02, B23Q39/04, B23Q1/01, B23B3/30 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B23Q1/015 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0003 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0032 (EP,US);
B23Q39/02 (EP,US);
B23Q39/048 (EP,US);
B23Q2039/008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/30] | B23Q41/02, B23Q39/04, B23Q1/01 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [2003/31] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Drehmaschine | [2001/30] | English: | Lathe | [2001/30] | French: | Tour | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) |
deleted | [2006/03] | 10.01.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.07.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.12.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.08.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.03.2005 | CH | 31.12.2005 | LI | 31.12.2005 | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/31] | FR | 02.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]DE19753898 (HUELLER HILLE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,10-20; | [YA]DE3337198 (MAUSER WERKE OBERNDORF [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,10-20; | [A]JPH01228701 (TSUGAMI KK) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |