EP1111035 - Combination of active agents for incorporation in detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blum, Helmut Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 30 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Erpenbach, Siglinde Neusser Strasse 20 40667 Meerbusch / DE | 03 /
Speckmann, Horst-Dieter, Dr. Eichenfeldstrasse 24 a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2001/26] | Application number, filing date | 00127120.4 | 12.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999161687 | 21.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19961687 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1111035 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1111035 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D3/386, C11D3/39, C11D3/50 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
C11D17/0034 (EP);
C11D3/0036 (EP);
C11D3/38672 (EP);
C11D3/39 (EP);
C11D3/3935 (EP);
C11D3/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/26] | Title | German: | Wirkstoffkombination zur Einarbeitung in Wasch- oder Reinigungsmittel | [2001/26] | English: | Combination of active agents for incorporation in detergent compositions | [2001/26] | French: | Combinaison d'agents actifs à incorporer dans des compositions détergentes | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19609953 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,10-13,15,16 * page 23 - page 24; claim - *; | [X]WO9502724 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-13,15,16 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5518649 (CHAPPLE ANDREW P [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,11-13,15 * column 3; example -; claim - * * column 5 *; | [X]EP0430603 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,11-13,15,16 * page 4; example -; claim - *; | [X]US4711748 (IRWIN CHARLES F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]DE19709284 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1-16 * column 9; examples 1-3; claim - *; | [E]WO0075270 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [E] 1-16 * examples 1-3; claim - * |