EP1110965 - Process for preparing 1,3-dihalo-1,1,3,3-tetra(organyl)disiloxanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abele, Bors Cajus, Dr. Burgkirchener Strasse 22 84489 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Winterfeld, Jörn, Dr. Wöhlerstrasse 30 84489 Burghausen / DE | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Budczinski, Angelika, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Budczinski, Angelika, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Budczinski, Angelika, et al c/o Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung PML, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127210.3 | 14.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999162567 | 23.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962567 | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110965 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110965 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
C07F7/0874 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2005/01] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1.3-Dihalogen-1.1.3.3-tetra(organyl)disiloxanen | [2001/26] | English: | Process for preparing 1,3-dihalo-1,1,3,3-tetra(organyl)disiloxanes | [2001/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1,3-dihalo-1,1,3,3-tetra(organyl)disiloxanes | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3412128 (NIELSEN JOHN M) [X] 1-5 * examples 1,2,4 *; | [A]GB631018 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |