EP1118461 - Multilayered resin plate and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umehara, Toshiyuki, c/oNitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Sakata, Yoshimasa, c/oNitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127354.9 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | JP19990355586 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35558699 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118461 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118461 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B31/28, B32B27/38 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B29C39/203 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B27/38 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/0007 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0076 (EP,US);
B32B2305/72 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2310/0831 (EP,US);
B32B2363/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (US);
B32B2457/208 (US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/09] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Merschichtige Harzplatte und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2001/30] | English: | Multilayered resin plate and process for producing the same | [2001/30] | French: | Plaque de résine multicouche et procédé pour fabriquer celle-ci | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5540875 (RUBIO RAFAEL R [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 63 * * column 5, line 54 - line 63 * * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 23; figure 6 *; | [XA]US5560959 (SHIMODA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1 - column 6; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-7; | [XA]US2268622 (HENRY ROONEY JAMES, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 54 - page 2, column 1, line 12; figure 1 * [A] 2,4; | [X]US4374890 (SHIMIZU MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 5 * column 4, line 47 - line 62 *; | [A]US4563395 (GILLNER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 2 * |