EP1108979 - Substrate film thickness measurement method, substrate film thickness measurement apparatus and substrate processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/25] | Method and apparatus for substrate film thickness measurement and substrate processing | ||
[2002/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/24] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimba, Toshifumi 3-12-16, Kugenuma Sakuragaoka Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakai, Shunsuke 3204-446, 3-2-3, Shiomidai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127374.7 | 13.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | JP19990353693 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35369399 | JP20000315212 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000315212 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1108979 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1108979 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108979 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B49/12, H01L21/66, G01B11/06, B24D7/12 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
B24B37/013 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
B08B1/32 (EP,US);
B24B49/12 (EP,US);
G01B11/0625 (EP,US);
G01B11/0683 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/25] | G01B11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/27] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Schichtdickenmessung und Substratverarbeitung | [2001/25] | English: | Substrate film thickness measurement method, substrate film thickness measurement apparatus and substrate processing apparatus | [2002/14] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour mesurer l'épaisseur d'une couche sur un substrat et pour le traitement dudit substrat | [2001/25] |
Former [2001/25] | Method and apparatus for substrate film thickness measurement and substrate processing | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10223578 ; | [XY]US5081796 (SCHULTZ LAURENCE D [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * column 3, line 1 - line 5 * * column 5, line 15 - line 35; figures 2,4 * [Y] 6,8; | [Y]US5657123 (MOGI KATSUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,8 * column 2, line 25 - line 42 * * column 3, line 39 - line 46 * * column 6, line 38 - line 67; figures 3-7 *; | [A]US5972162 (CESNA JOSEPH V [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 43 - line 54 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 32 ** column 6, line 5 - line 50; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US6000996 (FUJIWARA NARIAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 58 * * column 4, line 15 - line 55 * * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 30; figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10223578 A 19980821 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * |