EP1108540 - Apparatus and method for drop size switching in ink jet printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/13] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation, Patent Department Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korol, Steven V. 21600 N.E. Hideden Springs Road Dundee Oregon 97115 / US | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00127697.1 | 18.12.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | US19990172496P | 17.12.1999 Original published format: US 172496 P | US20000738676 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: US 738676 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108540 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1108540 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/045, B41J2/21 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04593 (EP,US);
B41J2/2128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/11] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Modulation der Tropfengrösse beim Tintenstrahldrucken | [2001/25] | English: | Apparatus and method for drop size switching in ink jet printing | [2001/25] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour changer la taille des gouttes pour l'impression jet d'encre | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0827838 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 1, line 31 - line 43 * * column 12, line 16 - column 13, line 51 * * figures 9,11,13 * [Y] 3-6; | [X]EP0738598 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 9,10 * figures 4,6 * * column 5, line 52 - column 7, line 34 *; | [Y]EP0962323 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-6 * paragraphs [0079] , [0095] * * figures 20,24,35 * | by applicant | US3946398 | US5124716 | US4639735 | US4746935 | US5689291 | US5677718 | US5389958 |