EP1217146 - Flooring tile and method for the manufacture of a floor covering using flooring tiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TWB Presswerk GmbH. & Co. KG. Sedanstrasse 3-9 58089 Hagen / DE | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blecher Peter Salmuthstrasse 2 58091 Hagen / DE | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Dörner, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. Stresemannstrasse 15 58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128040.3 | 21.12.2000 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1217146 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/06 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
E04F15/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bodenplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bodenbelages mit Hilfe von Bodenplatten | [2002/26] | English: | Flooring tile and method for the manufacture of a floor covering using flooring tiles | [2002/26] | French: | Dalle de plancher et procédé de réalisation d'un revêtement de sol en utilisant des dalles de plancher | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2242559 (HARRY VISSERING) [Y] 9,10 * page 1, column R, line 22 - page 3, column L, line 35; figures 1-9 *[A] 1,3; | [YA]CH371579 (EBENER FRITZ [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 1, line 57 - page 3, line 34; figures 1-9 * [A] 9,10; | [Y]DE2440449 (KASPAR KLAUS) [Y] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 7; figure . *; | [YA]DE4415465 (KEMMERICH GMBH GEB [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-6 * [A] 1-5 |