EP1110469 - Tack for button [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Hirokazu 605-2, Yoshida Kurobe-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128145.0 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19990367031 | 24.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36703199 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110469 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110469 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110469 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A44B1/28 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
A44B1/28 (EP,US);
A44B1/08 (KR);
Y10T24/3611 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3613 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3615 (EP,US);
Y10T24/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zapfen für Einsteckknopf | [2001/26] | English: | Tack for button | [2001/26] | French: | Tige d'assemblage de bouton à queue et contrepièce | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 06.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0144777 (NIPPON NOTION KOGYO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, line 16 * * page 9, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-4,11; claims 1,6,7,11 * [A] 4; | [Y]US4662033 (WIELAND JR HOWARD N [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7 * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, paragraph 3; figures 1-4; claims 1,3 *; | [XP]JP2000217610 ; | [A]DE2738703 (SCHAEFFER HOMBERG GMBH) [A] 5 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000217610 A 20000808 (ARAI:KK) [XP] 1,2 * abstract * |