EP1115241 - A portable communication device with means for measuring the altitude [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2001/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pai, Klaus Am Nussbaum 9 65239 Hohenstein / DE | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Section Law Department Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/28] | Gibson, Sarah Jane Motorola GmbH Law Dept. Intellectual Property Section, Hagenauer Strasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128197.1 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/28] | Priority number, date | US20000479765 | 07.01.2000 Original published format: US 479765 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1115241 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1115241 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04Q7/32, H04B1/38, G01L7/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
H04B1/3833 (EP);
G01C25/00 (EP);
G01C5/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/29] | A01K27/00, A01K15/02, H04B1/02, G08B23/00, A01M29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2001/28] | H04M1/725, H04Q7/32, H04B1/38, G01L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ein tragbares Kommunikationsgerät mit Mitteln zur Höhenmessung | [2001/28] | English: | A portable communication device with means for measuring the altitude | [2001/28] | French: | Un appareil de communication portable muni de moyens de mesure de l'altitude | [2001/28] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | New documents discovered [2001/28] | 19.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/20] | 30.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5210540 (MASUMOTO YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 36 - line 58 * * column 4, line 12 - line 25 * * column 4, line 50 - line 54 * * column 5, line 20 - line 27 * * column 7, line 21 - line 24; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0735380 (A T SYSTEM S P A [IT]) [A] 1,3 * column 17, line 19 - line 21 * * column 17, line 41 - line 47; figures 21,22 *; | [X]US5646857 (MCBURNEY PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 8, line 53 - line 60 * * column 10, line 44 - line 52 * * column 25, line 49 - line 52; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO9853573 (INTEGRATED DATA COMMUNICATIONS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract * * page 6, line 11 - line 17 * * page 6, line 24 - line 27 * * page 14, line 22 - line 29 * * page 22, line 21 - line 27 * * page 23, line 29 - line 32 * * page 30, line 20 - line 25 * * page 36, line 30 - page 37, line 16 * [A] 3,6,8; | [A]WO9854581 (PHATRAT TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,3-5,7 * page 6, line 4 - line 6 * * page 25, line 7 - line 13 * * page 53, line 26 - line 30 * * page 58, line 1 - line 8 * * page 60, line 1 - line 22 ** page 84, line 1 - line 21; figures 28,36,40,80,81 *; | [A]US5920287 (BELCHER DONALD K [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 21 - line 34 * * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 29; figure 10 * | Examination | EP0735380 | WO9853573 | US5920287 |