EP1110483 - Handle and a furniture part with a handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Union Knopf GmbH Lilienthalstrasse 2-4 33689 Bielefeld / DE | [2001/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck Stracke Loesenbeck Patentanwälte Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00128299.5 | 22.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | DE1999222727U | 23.12.1999 Original published format: DE 29922727 U | DE2000202651U | 14.02.2000 Original published format: DE 20002651 U | [2001/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1110483 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B95/02, A47B97/00, F21V33/00 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
F21V5/00 (EP,US);
A47B95/02 (EP);
E05B17/10 (EP);
F21V33/0012 (EP);
F21V33/0016 (EP);
A47B2095/028 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Griffelement und Möbelteil mit einem Griffelement | [2001/26] | English: | Handle and a furniture part with a handle | [2001/26] | French: | Poignée et un élément de meuble avec une poignée | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2146475 (SHEFFIELD BRICK GROUP PLC THE) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19610039 (WAGNER FRANZ XAVER [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29808342U (EISELE MORITZ [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, line 6 - line 7 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2775333 (MARTIN YANN [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 13 - line 25 ** figures 1-4 *; | [PY]DE20002648U (KOCH WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [PY] 4 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * * figure 1 *; | [PXY]DE29914083U (SCHMIDT EDGAR [DE]) [PX] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * the whole document * [PY] 4 | by applicant | DE29914936U |