EP1020841 - Screen recording system for operation reconstruction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enertec S.A. 185 Avenue du Général de Gaulle, B.P.316 92143 Clarmart Cedex / FR | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prevot, Franck 23bis, Boulevard Brune 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
Sulzer, Jean-Francois 38, rue de la Garenne 92310 Sevres / FR | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg "Le Clos du Golf" 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Richebourg, Michel François Cabinet Michel Richebourg, "Le Clos du Golf", 69, rue Saint-Simon 42000 Saint Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 00200081.8 | 11.01.2000 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | FR19990000429 | 14.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900429 | [2000/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020841 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G06F3/14 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
G09G5/00 (EP);
G06F3/1454 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2001/14] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildschirmaufzeichnungssystem zur Betriebswiederherstellung | [2000/29] | English: | Screen recording system for operation reconstruction | [2000/29] | French: | Système d'enregistrement d'écran pour reconstitution d'opération | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 13.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0762756 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,26-28 * Abrégé *; page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 31; figures 1-4 * [Y] 14; | [X]US5301018 (SMIDTH PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-7,26-28 * Abrégé *; column 1, line 11 - line 20; figures 1-5 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 35 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 10 * * column 9, line 10 - line 32 * * column 11, line 29 - column 12, line 23 * * column 14, line 39 - line 54 *; | [A]WO9519595 (FOX NETWORK SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,5,26-28 * Abrégé *; page 5, line 11 - line 17; figure 1 * * page 7, lines 7-13 * * page 16, line 21 - line 31 *; | [A]JPH10326111 ; | [A]JPS62266414 | [YA] - DE DIEULEVEULT G ET AL, "CARTE D'ACQUISITION VIDEO POUR PC", ELECTRONIQUE RADIO PLANS, (19901101), no. 516, ISSN 1144-5742, pages 29 - 41, XP000167988 [Y] 14 * page 29, column L, line 1 - column R, line 15; figure 19 * [A] 9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 099, no. 003, & JP10326111 A 19981208 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,5,26-28 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880507), vol. 12, no. 147, Database accession no. (P - 698), & JP62266414 A 19871119 (TOSHIBA CO.) [A] 1,5,26-28 * abstract * |