EP1033159 - Toy comprising a self-moving toy-figure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giochi Preziosi Lussemburgo S.A. 23, rue Beaumont 1219 Luxembourg / LU | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
La Greca, Gaetano Via Cesare Battisti, 37 20051 Limbiate (Milano) / IT | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00200778.9 | 03.03.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | WO1999IB00379 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: PCT/IB99/00379 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033159 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033159 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63H13/00 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
A63H13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/33] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spielzeug mit einer selbstbewegenden Spielzeugfigur | [2000/36] | English: | Toy comprising a self-moving toy-figure | [2000/36] | French: | Jouet comportant une figurine qui bouge de façon automatique | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.07.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2154890 (KIM DOUGLAS SOON TAEK) [A] 1,21,24 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9001575U (WAGNER SHOKAI) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2265839 (TAKARA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,24,25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5518784 (FUSSELL DAVID A [US]) [A] 8,11,20* column W *; | [A]FR2747587 (BELAT ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5846115 (FENG PAN-CHANG PAO [TW]) [A] 1,6,7,21,22,24 * column W * |