EP1017233 - Method and apparatus for displaying television program information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Change - Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemstar Development Corporation 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95050 / US | [2011/39] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Gemstar Development Corporation 6911 Hollywood Boulevard 12th Floor Los Angeles CA 90028 / US | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states E-Guide, Inc. 9100 Wilshire Boulevard, 7th Floor - West Tower Beverly Hills, California 90212 / US | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states YUEN, Henry C. P.O. Box 1159 Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | ||
For all designated states KWOH, Daniel S. 3975 Hampstead Road La Canada Flintridge, CA 91011 / US | |||
For all designated states MANKOVITZ, Roy J. 18057 Medley Drive Encino, CA 91316 / US | |||
For all designated states Leung, Elsie Y. 1302 Via Del Ray South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yuen, Henry C. P.O. Box 1159 Redondo Beach CA 90278 / US | 02 /
Kwoh, Daniel S. 3975 Hampstead Road La Canada/Flintridge CA 91011 / US | 03 /
Mankovitz, Roy J. 18057 Medley Drive Encino CA 91316 / US | 04 /
Leung, Elsie Y. 1302 Via Del Ray South Pasadena CA 91030 / US | [2004/24] |
Former [2001/38] | 01 /
Yuen, Henry C. P.O. Box 438 Pasadena, California 91102-0438 / US | ||
02 /
Kwoh, Daniel S. 3975 Hampstead Road LaCanada/Flintridge, California 91011 / US | |||
03 /
Mankovitz, Roy J. 24236 Park Granada Calabasas, California 91302 / US | |||
04 /
Leung, Elsie Y. P.O. Box 472 Pasadena, California 91102-0472 / US | |||
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00200971.0 | 31.08.1995 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19940298997 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: US 298997 | US19940312863 | 27.09.1994 Original published format: US 312863 | US19950369522 | 05.01.1995 Original published format: US 369522 | US19950424863 | 17.04.1995 Original published format: US 424863 | US19950475395 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 475395 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017233 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/088 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N21/8133 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N7/0884 (EP,US);
H04N7/0887 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N5/782 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/12] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anzeige von Fernsehprogrammnachrichten | [2000/27] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying television program information | [2000/27] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour afficher des programmes de télévision | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.06.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2009 | Observations by third parties | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/08] | 04.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.10.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/08] | Appeal following examination | 08.06.2012 | Appeal received No. T1890/12 | 13.08.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 16.08.2004 | Appeal received No. T1288/04 | 21.10.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.07.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95931687.8 / EP0806111 | Divisional application(s) | EP04075205.7 / EP1435733 | EP08103167.6 / EP1936967 | EP10178644.0 / EP2317759 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950931687) is 04.04.2000 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/44] |
Former [2009/20] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | BE DE ES FR GB IT | ||
Date: | 26.02.2009 | ||
[2014/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05122692 ; | [A]GB2217144 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 31,46 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 11; figure 1 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 1; figure 3 *; | [A]US5031045 (KAWASAKI MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,4,9,12,15,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0444496 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 31,46 * page 2, line 40 - line 52 * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0447968 (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,4,9,12,15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0497235 (EDICO SRL [IT]) [A] 31,46 * the whole document *; | [L]US5465385 (OHGA EIJI [JP], et al) [L] 1,4,9,12,15,17 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 017, no. 494, Database accession no. (E - 1428), & JP05122692 A 19930518 (PIONEER ELECTRON CORP) [A] 1,4,9,12,15,17 * abstract * | [A] - BRUGLIERA V, DIGITAL ON-SCREEN DISPLAY A NEW TECHNOLOGY FOR THE CONSUMER INTERFACE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TELEVISION SYMPOSIUM AND TECHNICAL EXHIBITION,CH,GENEVE, CCITT, VOL. SYMP. 18, PAGE(S) 571-586, XP000379382 [A] 31,46 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0339675 | WO9204801 | WO9416441 | - DINWIDDIE JM ET AL, "Combined-User Interface for Computers, Television, Video Recorders, And Telephone, Etc", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (19900801), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013090090 | by applicant | EP0682452 | other | - DINWIDDIE J.M., "Combined-User Interface for Computers, Television, Video Recorders, And Telephone, Etc", IP.COM JOURNAL, pages 116 - 118, XP013090090 | - BERTUCH M., "Des PC neue Wirklichkeiten - Multimedia Zwischen Anspruch und Kommerz", C'T, (1991), vol. 10, no. 40, pages 40-42,44 - 46, XP003025401 | - WINKLER M., "Computerkino - Computer und Video: Von TV-Konverter bis TV-Studio", C'T, (1992), vol. 10, page 100-104, 106-107, XP003025402 |