EP1029881 - Depolymerization to cyclic ethers using selected metal compound catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drysdale, Neville Everton 227 Welch Tract road Newark, DE 19702-1026 / US | 02 /
Bockrath, Richard Edmund 2314 West 17th Street Wilmington, DE 19806-1331 / US | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2000/34] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00201220.1 | 20.10.1993 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | US19920964313 | 21.10.1992 Original published format: US 964313 | US19930021368 | 23.02.1993 Original published format: US 21368 | US19930093243 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: US 93243 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029881 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029881 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029881 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/10, C08G65/26, C08G65/32, C07D307/08 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
C08G65/321 (EP);
C08G65/10 (KR);
C07D307/06 (EP);
C07D307/08 (EP);
C07F17/00 (EP);
C07F7/003 (EP);
C08G63/42 (EP);
C08G63/58 (EP);
C08G63/6856 (EP);
C08G65/16 (EP);
C08G65/20 (EP);
C08G65/26 (KR);
C08G65/2645 (EP);
C08G65/266 (EP);
C08G65/32 (EP);
C08G65/323 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | C08G65/10, C08G65/20, C08G65/32, C07D307/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL [2000/34] | Title | German: | Depolymerisation zu zyclischen Ethern unter Verwendung der Katalysatoren aus gewählten Metallverbindungen | [2000/34] | English: | Depolymerization to cyclic ethers using selected metal compound catalysts | [2000/34] | French: | Dépolymérisation pour obtenir des éthers cycliques à l'aide de la catalyse par des composés métalliques choisis | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93924316.8 / EP0665859 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8802661 (OLAH GEORGE A [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 1 - line 6 * * page 10, line 10 - line 13 *; | [A]US4153786 (PRUCKMAYR GERFRIED) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,3 *; | JPH07231438 [ ] (MIHARU COMMUNICATION); | [A]US4115408 (BAKER MELVIN CHARLES) [A] 1-8 * claim - *; | [A]JPS62240319 ; | [A]JPS61120832 | [X] - P. DREYFUSS ET AL.:, "Graft copolymers by oxonium polymerization", POLYMER LETTERS ED., (1976), vol. 14, pages 139 - 142, XP002163269 [X] 1-8 * page 142, column 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1976.130140304 | [A] - MATSUKURA K. ET AL.:, "Polyether esters produced by using yttrium catalysts", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19730423), vol. 78, no. 16, Database accession no. 98454j, XP002163270 [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 45, Database accession no. 1987-337120, XP002163271 & JPS62240319 A 19871021 (MITSUBISHI CHEM. IND. K.K.) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 25, Database accession no. 1986-187083, XP002163272 & JPS61120832 A 19860607 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND. K.K.) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |