EP1070514 - Apparatus and method for temporarily inserting a radioactive source in an animal body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nucletron B.V. Waardgelder 1 3905 TH Veenendaal / NL | [2001/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löffler, Edgar German Bresserbergerstrasse 72 47533 Kleve / DE | 02 /
Van 't Hooft, Eric Ter Borcht 29 2930 Brasschaat / BE | 03 /
Schot, Hans Martin Plantagelaan 4 3903 XL Veenendaal / NL | 04 /
Koster, Albert Dirk Adrianus Steenweg 15 bis 3511 JK Utrecht / NL | 05 /
Johnson, Lu Anne 1917 29 3/4 Avenue Rice Lake, 54868 WI / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/49] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/04] | Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 00201947.9 | 02.06.2000 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | NL19991012698 | 23.07.1999 Original published format: NL 1012698 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070514 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070514 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M36/00, A61D7/00, A61N5/10 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
A61M37/0069 (EP,US);
A61D7/00 (EP,US);
A61N5/1007 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1011 (EP,US);
A61N5/1027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/41] |
Former [2001/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät und Methode zur temporären Implantation einer radioaktiven Quelle in einen Tierkörper | [2001/04] | English: | Apparatus and method for temporarily inserting a radioactive source in an animal body | [2001/04] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour implanter temporairement une source radioactive dans le corps d'un animal | [2003/48] |
Former [2001/04] | Appareil et méthode pour temporairement implanter une source radioactive dans un corps d'animal | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB788833 (ULRICH KONRAD HENSCHKE); | [A]DE2736318 (HOOFT ERIC VAN T) [A] 4-6 * column A; figure 2 *; | [A]NL9302140 (BENEDICT MARIE DOORSCHODT) [A] 4,9,10 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5524644 (CROOK BERWYN M [US]) [A] 4 * column A; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]WO9622123 (MEDCHEM PRODUCTS INC [US]); | [A]US5814073 (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [A] 4 * column A; figures 1,4,5 * | Examination | US5851172 |