EP1167533 - Methods and means for the complementation of viral protein expression in stable cell lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERENIGING VOOR CHRISTELIJK WETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERWIJS De Boelelaan 1105 NL-1081 HV Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states VERENIGING VOOR CHRISTELIJK WETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERWIJS De Boelelaan 1105 NL-1081 HV Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Beusechem, Victor Willem Rustenburgerstraat 362-hs 1072 HE Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Gerritsen, Willem-Ronald C. Huijgenslaan 31 1422 HE Uithoorn / NL | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 00202204.4 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167533 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N15/861, C12N5/10, C12N15/34, C07K14/075 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N2710/10343 (EP);
C12N2710/10352 (EP);
C12N2810/6018 (EP);
C12N2830/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Mittel zur Komplementation von viraler Proteinexpression in stabilen Zelllinien | [2002/01] | English: | Methods and means for the complementation of viral protein expression in stable cell lines | [2002/01] | French: | Procédés et moyens pour la complémentation d'expression de protéines virales dans des lignées cellulaires stables | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 02.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.09.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0856585 (INTROGENE BV [NL]) [A] 1-14* column W *; | [Y]WO9854346 (GENVEC INC [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * page 22 - page 24, paragraph 1 *; | [XY]EP0919624 (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,11-13 * page 7, line 10 - line 18 * * page 9, line 11 - line 18 * * example 5; claims 19,20 * [Y] 9,10 |