EP1055956 - Diving mask with lenses and method of fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRANHOUSE, Jon 838 Hartzell Street Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US | [2000/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00202885.0 | 28.08.1992 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | US19910750988 | 28.08.1991 Original published format: US 750988 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055956 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1055956 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1055956 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02C1/00, G02C11/08, G02C7/02, A61F9/02, A63B33/00, B63C11/12 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
G02C7/02 (EP);
A63B33/002 (EP,US);
B63C11/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/48] | G02C1/00, G02C11/08, G02C7/02, A61F9/02, A63B33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | Tauchermaske mit Linsen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2000/48] | English: | Diving mask with lenses and method of fabricating the same | [2000/48] | French: | Masque de plongée avec lentilles et sa méthode de fabrication | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92919308.4 / EP0602148 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2002 | 31.08.2004 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3671976 (JOHNSON CLARENCE S, et al) [A] 1,8* column 3, line 5 - line 10; figure 1 * | by applicant | US1742412 | US2088262 | US2928097 | US3040616 | US3172750 | US3899244 | US3944345 | US4607398 |