EP1083560 - Hybrid optical recording disc with copy protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ha, Bruce, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Glaza, Steven A., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Bianchi, Cheryl M., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/16] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/11] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00202987.4 | 28.08.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | US19990393527 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: US 393527 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083560 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083560 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G11B7/007, G06F1/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G11B20/00094 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1259 (EP,US);
G11B7/0037 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/27] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hybride optische Aufzeichnungsplatte mit Kopierschutz | [2001/11] | English: | Hybrid optical recording disc with copy protection | [2001/11] | French: | Disque d'enregistrement optique hybride avec protection contre la copie | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M40) | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/35] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0809244 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 2-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO9744736 (APPLE COMPUTER [US]) [A] 7,8 * page 7, lines 10-15 *; | [A]EP0899733 (SONY DADC AUSTRIA AG [AT]) [A] 2-8 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0041] * * page 5, columns 6-7 *; | [X]US5930825 (NAITO KAZUNORI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 23 *; | [A] - KAWANISHI T ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF COMPACT DISK-WRITE-ONCE HYBRID DISK", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (1992), vol. 31, no. 2B, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 688 - 690, XP000828176 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.31.688 | [A] - "Data interchange on read-only 120 mm optical data disks (CD-ROM), second edition", STANDARD ECMA, XX, XX, (199606), no. ECMA-130, XP002143627 [A] 3,4 * paragraph [0020] * |