EP1088664 - A self-cleaning ink jet printer system with a reversible fluid flow and a method of assembling the printer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharma, Ravi, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Quenin, John A., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Delametter, Christopher N., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Meichle, Michael E., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Moghadam, Omid A., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 06 /
Stevens, Walter S., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2001/14] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00203194.6 | 14.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | US19990407451 | 28.09.1999 Original published format: US 407451 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088664 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088664 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
B41J2/16552 (EP,US);
B41J2/16585 (EP,US);
B41J2/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selbstreinigendes Tintenstrahldruckersystem mit umkehrbarer Flüssigkeitsströmungsrichtung und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau des Druckersystems | [2001/14] | English: | A self-cleaning ink jet printer system with a reversible fluid flow and a method of assembling the printer system | [2001/14] | French: | Système d'imprimante à jet d'encre auto-nettoyant à écoulement de fluide réversible et méthode d'assemblage du système d'imprimante | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 06.12.2007 | FR | 02.05.2008 | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/36] | DE | 06.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5722063 ; | [A]JPS62113555 ; | [A]US4296418 (YAMAZAKI HIROSHI, et al) [A] 6,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4734718 (IWAGAMI FUSAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12* column 3, line 3 *; | [A]EP0292779 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 4,5,8,15,17,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US4908636 (SAITO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 3; figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP0509687 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 8, line 11 - line 41; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0936071 (OCE TECH BV [NL]) [A] 4,5,8,15,17,18 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820521), vol. 006, no. 083, Database accession no. (M - 130), & JP57022063 A 19820204 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 3,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871028), vol. 011, no. 330, Database accession no. (M - 636), & JP62113555 A 19870525 (CANON INC) [A] 4,5,8,15,17,18 * abstract * | Examination | EP1005997 | by applicant | US4970535 |