EP1092560 - Pink dye-donor element for thermal colour proofing. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/16] | Pink dye for thermal color proofing | ||
[2002/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapman, Derek D., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Kaszczuk, Linda A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Harris, Mark A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2001/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patents, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00203457.7 | 04.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | US19990418233 | 14.10.1999 Original published format: US 418233 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092560 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092560 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38, C09B23/10, G03F3/10 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B41M5/3854 (EP,US);
B41M5/465 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/02] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rosa Farbstoffdonorelement für thermische Farbauszüge. | [2002/49] | English: | Pink dye-donor element for thermal colour proofing. | [2002/49] | French: | Colorant rose pour élément donneur de colorant pour des épreuves-couleur thermiques. | [2002/49] |
Former [2001/16] | Rosa Farbstoff für thermische Farbauszüge | ||
Former [2001/16] | Pink dye for thermal color proofing | ||
Former [2001/16] | Colorant rose pour des épreuves-couleur thermiques | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPS5314734 ; | [AD]JPS5299379 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5030708 (KRUTAK JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 57 ** examples 4,8; claims 1,5,7,12,14,17,21,24,26,28,34,36; tables 1,2,8 *; | [X]DE4440066 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 1 - line 17 * * page 3, line 45 - line 55 * * page 5, line 63 - line 66 * * claims 1,6,7 *; | [X]DE19650958 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 1 - line 28 * * page 3, line 56 - line 59 * * examples 1-35; claims 1-6 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19780427), vol. 002, no. 059, Database accession no. (C - 012), & JP53014734 A 19780209 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [AD] 1-9 * abstract * |