EP1099626 - Aft egress and control device for an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company D/676/ M/S 110-WSB43 P.O. Box 2515 Seal Beach California 90740-1515 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states The Boeing Company D/676/ M/S 110-WSB43, P.O. Box 2515 Seal Beach, California 90740-1515 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Philips Whitlock, Jennifer 18605 Park Ridge Lane Huntington Beach, California 92648 / US | 02 /
Rawdon, Blaine K. 1471 Paseo Del Mar San Pedro, California 90731 / US | 03 /
Wakayama, Sean R. 10625 Bell Street Stanton, California 90680-1967 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/20] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00203468.4 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990438090 | 10.11.1999 Original published format: US 438090 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099626 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099626 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B64C39/10 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B64D11/00 (EP,US);
B64C1/22 (EP,US);
B64C3/00 (EP,US);
B64C39/10 (EP,US);
B64C2039/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hecknotausgangs- und Steuerungsvorrichtung für ein Flugzeug | [2001/20] | English: | Aft egress and control device for an aircraft | [2001/20] | French: | Système de sortie de secours arrière et de contrôle pour un aéronef | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 17.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1987050 (BURNELLI VINCENT J) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US2650780 (NORTHROP JOHN K, et al) [A] 1-22 * figures 5-9 *; | [YA]US2942813 (ENGLISH LE ROY F) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 21 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3-22; | [A]GB1245432 (AEREON CORP [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, lines 89-105 * * figure 7 *; | [YA]US5893535 (HAWLEY ARTHUR V [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 19 * * figures 4-7 * [A] 3-22 |