EP1090681 - Crystallisation reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paques B.V. P.O. Box 52 T. de Boerstraat 11-13 NL-8560 AB Balk / NL | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vellinga, Sjoerd Hubertus Jozef Pastoriesingel 23 8458 CP Tjalleberd / NL | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2001/15] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00203502.0 | 09.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | NL19991013238 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: NL 1013238 | [2001/15] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1090681 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, B01J19/00, C02F1/52 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
B01D21/0024 (EP);
B01D21/003 (EP);
B01D21/0042 (EP);
B01D21/2411 (EP);
B01D21/2427 (EP);
B01J19/2405 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2002/01] |
Former [2001/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kristallisationsreaktor | [2001/15] | English: | Crystallisation reactor | [2001/15] | French: | Réacteur à crystallisation | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 12.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 21.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/02] | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB987638 (FYLDE WATER BOARD) [DA] 1-3,6,8,11 * page 1, column L, line 32 - page 2, column L, line 53 * * figure - *; | [A]US4412923 (CAPITANI ENZO [FR], et al) [A] 1-5,8,11 * column A * * column 6, line 13 - line 61 * * figure - *; | [XA]EP0157562 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 9 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 3,4; | [A]JPS56166911 ; | JPS56166911 [ ]; | [A]GB1094878 (STANDARD MESSO G M B H) [A] 1 * page 2, column L, line 25 - line 64 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3814723 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS58104603 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820409), vol. 006, no. 054, Database accession no. (C - 097), & JP56166911 A 19811222 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [A] 1-5,9 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 06, Database accession no. 1982-10521e, XP002139480 & JPS56166911 A 19811222 (KURITA WATER IND. LTD.) [ ] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830909), vol. 007, no. 205, Database accession no. (C - 185), & JP58104603 A 19830622 (TORAY KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |