EP1112747 - Salmonella vaccine not inducing antibodies against flagellin or flagella [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2001/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nuijten, Petrus Johannes Maria De Linde 10 5831 RD Boxmeer / NL | 02 /
Witvliet, Maarten Hendrik Buitenhof 36 5807 BW Oostrum / NL | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Mestrom, Joannes Jozef Louis, et al Intervet International B.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 31 5830 AA Boxmeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Mestrom, Joannes Jozef Louis, et al Intervet International B.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 31 5830 AA Boxmeer / NL | ||
Former [2002/05] | Mestrom, Joannes Jozef Louis, et al INTERVET INTERNATIONAL B.V. P.O. Box 31 5830 AA Boxmeer / NL | ||
Former [2001/27] | Mestrom, Joannes Jozef Louis, et al N.V. Organon, Postbus 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 00204630.8 | 19.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | EP19990204564 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: EP 99204564 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112747 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112747 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/112, A61P31/04, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:42) | [2001/27] | CPC: |
A61K39/0275 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/521 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Salmonella Impfstoff, der keinen Antikörper gegen Flagellin oder gegen Flagella induziert | [2001/27] | English: | Salmonella vaccine not inducing antibodies against flagellin or flagella | [2001/27] | French: | Vaccin contre les Salmonella n'induisant pas d'anticorps réagissant avec la flagelline ou les flagelles | [2004/03] |
Former [2001/27] | Vaccin contre Salmonella n'induisant pas d'anticorps réagissant avec la flagelline or les flagelles | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 04.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.06.2004 | LU | 19.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/45] | MC | 31.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1109179 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1-5,7-13 * claims 1-24 *; | [A]US4886748 (ASAKA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 5* claims 1-30 *; | [X] - HE XIAO-SONG ET AL, "Hypervariable region IV of Salmonella gene fliC-d encodes a dominant surface epitope and a stabilizing factor for functional flagella.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 176, no. 8, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 2406 - 2414, XP000946785 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * |