EP1134636 - Editor for process planning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | For all designated states Siemens Business Services GmbH & Co. OHG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aumer, Richard An der Hufe 1 01478 Weixdorf / DE | 02 /
Gröger, Wolfgang Heideweg 5 01109 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Winfrid Elisenhof 39 33098 Paderborn / DE | 04 /
Schmalzbauer, Klaus Am Weingert 12 93186 Pettendorf / DE | 05 /
Irsch, Bernd Kappadocia 5e 91126 Schnabach / DE | 06 /
Zedlacher, Winfrid Walter v.d. Vogelweidestr. 13 9300 St. Veit/Glan / AT | 07 /
Neumayer, Martin Blütenweg 5 84094 Elsendorf / DE | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00250090.8 | 10.03.2000 | [2001/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134636 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
G05B19/41865 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32099 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32128 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32155 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Editor zur Erstellung von Prozessplänen | [2001/38] | English: | Editor for process planning | [2001/38] | French: | Editeur de planification de processus | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9967689 (CREATIVE LIFESTYLES INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 34 - page 11, line 8; figures 3-5 *; | [X]JPH0991128 ; | [X]US5442731 (TANAKA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,18 * column 14, line 18 - column 17, line 23; figures 6-8 *; | [A]EP0573912 (HEHL KARL [DE]) [A] 1-24 * column 4, line 9 - column 11, line 29; figures 1,11 *; | [A]DE19740974 (WOHLENBERG BUCHBINDERSYSTEME G [DE]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09091128 A 19970404 (MEIDENSHA CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * |