EP1059467 - Chain with one direction of rigidity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arnold & Stolzenberg GmbH Ortsteil Juliusmühle 37557 Einbeck / DE | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ragnitz, Detlef Am Pfarrgarten 60 37586 Dassel Markoldendorf / DE | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2000/50] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Kurfürstendamm 170 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 00250161.7 | 24.05.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE1999210380U | 08.06.1999 Original published format: DE 29910380 U | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059467 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/18 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
E05F11/06 (EP);
F16G13/20 (EP);
E05Y2201/656 (EP);
E05Y2201/724 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rückensteife Kette | [2000/50] | English: | Chain with one direction of rigidity | [2000/50] | French: | Chaîne rigide dans une direction | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR848483 (KRUPP AG) [Y] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1082464 (MEILLER A) [Y] 1-4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US1570014 (STEVENS HARRY P) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1534726 (TELEFLEX MORSE LTD) [A] 1,5,7 * page 2, line 78 - line 120; figures 1-6,10 *; | [A]US3302388 (STEWART GENTSCH CHARLES) [A] 5,7 * column 2, line 15 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE29910380U (ARNOLD & STOLZENBERG GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3315779 (HECKMANN FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [AD]DE4124281 (RYOEI ENGINEERING CO [JP]) | by applicant | DE3315779 | DE4124281 |