EP1016882 - Output circuit for a charge detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integrated Detector & Electronics AS Veritasveien 9 1322 Hovik / NO | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nygard, Einar c/o Integrated Detector & Electronics (IDE AS) Pb. 315, Veritasveien 9 N-1323 Horvik / NO | [2000/32] |
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
Nygard, Einar Bjornkollen 27 1344 Haslum / NO | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300018.9 | 05.01.2000 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | IL19980127879 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: IL 12787998 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016882 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016882 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29, G01T1/17 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
G01T1/17 (EP);
H04N25/671 (EP);
G01R29/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | G01T1/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ladungsdetektor-Ausgangsschaltung | [2000/27] | English: | Output circuit for a charge detector | [2000/27] | French: | Circuit de sortie pour d'un detecteur de charge | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4672207 (DERENZO STEPHEN E [US]); | [A]US4893018 (SAITOU SATOSHI [JP]); |