EP1028018 - Vehicle fuel rerservoir pot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Land Rover Group Limited Banbury Road Lighthorne Warwick CV35 0RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Land Rover Group Limited Banbury Road Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states ROVER GROUP LIMITED International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park Warwick, Warwickshire CV34 6RG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whittaker, Howard Iain Werkstrasse 23A 85445 Schwaig / DE | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Land Rover Patent Department (53G16/4) Banbury Road Lightthorne Warwickshire CV35 0RG / GB | [2009/40] |
Former [2003/42] | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Land Rover, Patent Department 53G 16/4, Banbury Road, Lighthorne Warwick CV35 0RG / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Land Rover Patent Department (53W5/12) Warwick Technology Park Warwick CV34 6RG / GB | ||
Former [2001/21] | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Land Rover, Gaydon Engineering Centre, 53/G/9/1, Banbury Road Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 ORG / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Farrow, Robert Michael, et al Rover Group Limited Patent Department Gaydon Test Centre Banbury Road Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 ORG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300435.5 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | GB19990002982 | 11.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902982 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1028018 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1028018 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1028018 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/077 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
F02M37/025 (EP);
B60K15/077 (EP);
B60K2015/03105 (EP);
B60K2015/03236 (EP);
F02M37/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/07] |
Former [2000/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stautopf für Fahrzeugkraftstoff | [2000/33] | English: | Vehicle fuel rerservoir pot | [2000/33] | French: | Bol anti-désamorçage pour le réservoir d'un véhicule | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 23.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.01.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB1515800 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3927688 (DELCO ELECTRONIC OVERSEAS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - line 57; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0803394 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1* figure - *; | [DA]US5699773 (KLEPPNER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB1515800 | US5699773 |