EP1029524 - An invalid lifting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arjo. Med.Aktiebolag Limited St Catherine Street Gloucester, GL1 3SL / GB | [2003/23] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states ARJO LIMITED St. Catherine Street Gloucester, GL1 2SL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunn, Robert 187 Alstone Lane Cheltenham, Gloucester / GB | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Higgins, Michael Roger A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Higgins, Michael Roger A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300560.0 | 26.01.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | GB19990002466 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902466 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029524 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029524 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029524 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A61G7/1017 (EP,US);
A61G7/1046 (EP,US);
A61G7/1096 (EP,US);
A61G2200/34 (EP,US);
A61G2200/36 (EP,US);
A61G2200/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/35] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hebevorrichtung für Behinderte | [2000/34] | English: | An invalid lifting device | [2000/34] | French: | Dispositif servant à soulever une personne invalide | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.01.2005 | CH | 26.01.2005 | CY | 26.01.2005 | FI | 26.01.2005 | LI | 26.01.2005 | LU | 26.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | PT | 26.06.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LU | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LU | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
CH | 26.01.2005 | ||
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
LI | 26.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 26.01.2005 | |
FI | 26.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 26.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8436687U (HASSLER JAN ET AL) [A] 1* figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4569094 (HART LAWRENCE D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0547901 (PARKER ROY [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |