EP1027888 - Osmotic system for delivery of solid amorphous dispersions of drugs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701-8599 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Bend Research, Inc 64550 Research Road Bend OR 97701-8599 / US | ||
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Appel, Leah Elizabeth 4051 Northcliff Drive Bend, Oregon 97701 / US | 02 /
Curatolo, William John Pfizer Inc., Central Res. Div., Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | 03 /
Herbig, Scott Max Pfizer Inc., Central Res. Div., Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | 04 /
Nightingale, James Alan Schriver P.O. Box 8026 Bend, Oregon 97708 / US | 05 /
Thombre, Avinash Govind Pfizer Inc., Central Res. Div., Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | Hill, Richard, et al Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Kendrick, David Alan, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/33] | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300572.5 | 26.01.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | US19990119406P | 10.02.1999 Original published format: US 119406 P | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1027888 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1027888 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1027888 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/26 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K9/146 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Osmotisches System zur Verabreichung von Wirkstoffen, die feste amorphe Dispersionen enthalten | [2000/33] | English: | Osmotic system for delivery of solid amorphous dispersions of drugs | [2000/33] | French: | Dispositif osmotique pour délivrer des dispersions solides amorphes des médicaments | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | IT | 10.06.2009 | NL | 10.06.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | ES | 21.09.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | LU | 26.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0344603 (ZERIA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-48 * page 3, line 4 - line 20 * * examples 1-6 * * claim - *; | [A]US5035897 (AYER ATUL D [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * figures 1-4; example - * * claim - *; | [DX]US5516527 (CURATOLO WILLIAM J [US]) [DX] 1-6,8,10-13,15-21,23-26,29,32,33,36-41,43,48 * the whole document * * and especially:;; figure 5; example 17 * * claim - *; | [X]US5736159 (CHEN CHIH-MING [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10,12-19,25-41,48 * the whole document * * and especially:;; figure 3; example 1 * * claim - *; | [T]EP0901786 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [T] 1-48* the whole document *; | [A] - SANTUS G AND BAKER RW, "Osmotic drug delivery: a review of the patent literature", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, (19950701), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 1 - 21, XP004037488 [A] 1-48 * page 6, column L, paragraph L - page 19, column L, paragraph 1; figures 8-16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(95)00013-X | [A] - YAMAGUCHI T ET AL, "Improvement of Pharmaceutical Properties of 4-O-(4- methoxyphenyl)acetyltylosin Using Solid Dispersion with Carboxymethylethylcellulose", YAKUZAIGAKU,JP,YAKUJI NIPPO-SHA, TOKYO, (1993), vol. 53, no. 4, ISSN 0372-7629, pages 221 - 228, XP002121600 [A] 1-48 * abstract * | by applicant | US4327725 | US4612008 |