EP1028428 - Conductor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited 1000 Aztec West, Almondsbury Bristol BS12 4SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnes, William Bryan 17 Saxon Way Bradley Stoke, Bristol, BS32 9AR / GB | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Neobard, William John, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300627.7 | 27.01.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | GB19990003254 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9903254 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028428 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/00, H01L23/00 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
G11C7/22 (EP,US);
G06F30/39 (EP,US);
G11C5/063 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (EP,US);
H01L23/5222 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/18] |
Former [2000/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Leiterstruktur | [2000/33] | English: | Conductor structure | [2000/33] | French: | Structure de conducteur | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/08] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04221837 ; | [A]JPH08101854 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-8; | US5883812 [ ] (FUJII TAKASHI [JP]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [A]US5288949 (CRAFTS HAROLD S [US]) [A] 3-5 * column 1, lines 34-40; figures 6,7 * * column 2, lines 23-30 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921210), vol. 016, no. 570, Database accession no. (E - 1297), & JP04221837 A 19920812 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |