EP1023835 - Enhancement of the efficacy of benzoylbenzenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states American Cyanamid Company Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aven, Michael Rathenaustrasse No.8 55131 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Cotter, Henry Van Tuyl 34 Chelsmford Court Trenton, New Jersey 08618 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Riedl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR) Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Riedl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner(GbR), Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/43] | Langfinger, Klaus Dieter, et al Director Patents & Licensing, BASF Aktiengesellschaft ZDX/P-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | Walters, Philip Bernard William, et al Wyeth Laboratories, Patents & Trade Marks Department, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300668.1 | 28.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | US19990239646 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: US 239646 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023835 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023835 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/04, // (A01N35/04, 25:30) | [2000/31] | CPC: |
A01N35/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N35/04, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N35/04, A01N25/30 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | Verstärkung der Wirksamkeit bei Benzoylbenzenen | [2000/31] | English: | Enhancement of the efficacy of benzoylbenzenes | [2000/31] | French: | Augmentation de l'efficacité des benzoylbenzènes | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2005
10.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SYNGENTA LIMITED European General Centre Priestley Road, Surrey Research Park Guilford, Surrey, GU2 7YH / GB Opponent's representative Ward, Steven Paul Syngenta Limited Intellectual Property Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell, Berkshire RG42 6YA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2005
10.05.2005
ADMISSIBLE SYNGENTA LIMITED European General Centre Priestley Road, Surrey Research Park Guilford, Surrey, GU2 7YH / GB Opponent's representative Ward, Steven Paul Syngenta Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill International Research Centre, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell RG42 6YA / GB | 08.06.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2006 | 27.09.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.01.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.01.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2004 | BE | 04.08.2004 | FI | 04.08.2004 | IT | 04.08.2004 | DK | 04.11.2004 | GR | 04.11.2004 | SE | 04.11.2004 | PT | 04.01.2005 | CY | 28.01.2005 | IE | 28.01.2005 | LU | 28.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
IT | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2005 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2005 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
LU | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
BE | 04.08.2004 | ||
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
DK | 04.11.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
GR | 04.11.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 04.08.2004 | |
FI | 04.08.2004 | ||
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 04.08.2004 | |
SE | 04.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 04.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0230598 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 33 - line 42 *; | [Y]WO9522896 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 16 - line 32 * * page 3, line 7 - line 21 *; | [DYX]EP0727141 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [DY] 1-10 * page 3, line 11 - line 57 * * page 11, line 43 - line 47 * * page 12, line 8 * * page 12, line 33 - line 41 * * page 12, line 52 - line 54 * [X] 1-10; | [PX]EP0897904 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 14 * * page 9, line 21 - line 24 ** page 10, line 1 - line 48 *; | [PX]EP0899255 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 50 * * page 7, line 50 - line 53 *; | [PX]EP0933025 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 3, line 49 - page 4, line 29 * * page 5, line 34 - line 36 * * page 6, line 2 - line 17 *; | [PX]EP0967196 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [PX] 1-10 * page 2, line 25 - line 56 * * page 8, line 28 - line 31 * * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 25 *; | [Y] - V.DERYCKE ET AL., "Effect of adjuvants on the activity of fungicides in winter wheat under field conditions", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002137253 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - MEDED. - FAC. LANBOUWKD. TOEGEPASTE BIOL. WET. (UNIV. GENT), (1998), vol. 63, no. 3b, pages 1041 - 1045 | [Y] - M.A.AMER ET AL., "Role of some adjuvants in influencing the efficacy of fungicides on chocolate spot (Botrytis fabae) of broad bean", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002137254 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - MEDED. - FAC. LANDBOUWKD. TOEGEPASTE BIOL. WET. (UNIV. GENT), (1994), vol. 59, no. 3a, pages 1089 - 1101 |