EP1024482 - Actuator base for optical pickup and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Ken'ichi Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd., 8-8-2, Kokuryo-cho Chofu-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300682.2 | 28.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | JP19990019806 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1980699 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024482 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/22 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
G11B7/0933 (EP);
G11B7/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2001/16] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Betätigertragegestell für optisches Abtastgerät sowie Herstellungsverfahren desselben | [2000/31] | English: | Actuator base for optical pickup and method for manufacturing the same | [2000/31] | French: | Chassis d'actionneur pour tête optique ainsi que pson procédé de fabrication | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 03.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0323023 ; | [A]EP0419097 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3* figure 9; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0525742 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5303089 (OHNO TAKEHIDE [JP]) [A] 1,3 * page 12; figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5687030 (TOYAMA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 8; figure 7; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910410), vol. 015, no. 142, Database accession no. (M - 1101), & JP03023023 A 19910131 (SANKOO:KK) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |