EP1026598 - Adaptive pci slot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Matthias 224 Hollow Oaks Court Roseville, Californai 95678 / US | 02 /
Babb, Samuel M. 5317 Fossil Creek Drive Fort Collins, Colorado 80526 / US | 03 /
Allan, Scott P. 1323 Red Oak Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 00300776.2 | 01.02.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | US19990245509 | 02.02.1999 Original published format: US 245509 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026598 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026598 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G06F1/263 (EP,US);
G06F13/4081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/24] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Adaptiver PCI-Schlitz | [2000/32] | English: | Adaptive pci slot | [2000/32] | French: | Fente PCI adaptive | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5421734 (MACWILLIAMS PETER [US]) [Y] 15 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 9; figures 2-5 *; | [XY]US5627416 (KANTNER EDWARD A [US]) [X] 1,3,4,11,16 * column 1, line 30 - line 52; figures 1,5 * [Y] 15; | [A]US5632039 (WALKER RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1,16* column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 49; figure 1 * |