EP1031913 - A communication terminal having a predictive editor application. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Stephen Oraskuja 1 A3 33820 Tempere / FI | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | van Walstijn, Gerard Nordic Patent Service A/S Højbro Plads 10 1200 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | van Walstijn, Bartholomeus Gerard G. WIP / Walstijn Intellectual Property Parkovsvej 3 2820 Gentofte / DK | ||
Former [2000/35] | Jeffery, Kendra Louise Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301072.5 | 11.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | GB19990004013 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9904013 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031913 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031913 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031913 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023, H04M1/72 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/0237 (EP,US);
H04M1/2748 (EP,US);
H04M1/27463 (EP,US);
H04M1/72436 (EP,US);
H04M2250/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2002/08] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kommunikationsendgerät mit prädiktiver Editor-Anwendung | [2000/35] | English: | A communication terminal having a predictive editor application. | [2000/35] | French: | Terminal de communication possédant une application d'éditeur de texte prédictif | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02029094.6 / EP1296216 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0570116 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,2,4,7 * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 18 *; | [A]EP0732646 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,7,10 * column 17, line 1 - line 42 * * column 21, line 6 - line 32 * * column 23, line 31 - column 24, line 19 *; | [X]WO9705541 (KING MARTIN T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 16 * * page 14, line 1 - line 13 * * page 21, line 23 - page 23, line 20 * * page 27, line 26 - page 29, line 10 * * page 30, line 21 - page 31, line 2 * * page 34, line 26 - line 29 *; | [Y]US5742669 (LIM BOON-CHEN [HK]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 5 *; | [DXY]WO9833111 (TEGIC COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,7-10 * page 9, line 24 - line 27 * * page 11, line 29 - page 12, line 8 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 10 * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 23 * * page 26, line 16 - page 28, line 22 * * page 33, line 27 - page 35, line 21 * * page 36, line 14 - page 37, line 12 * * page 38, line 11 - line 24 * * page 39, line 18 - page 40, line 2 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US5838783 (CHENG FRANK S [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 7 *; | [L] - "Nokia 3210 User's Guide", NOKIA, (1999), pages 39 - 41, URL: http://www.nokia.com/pdf/nokia_pickyaama.pdf, (20010320), XP002163603 [L] 1-10 * the whole document * |