EP1030227 - Powder toner accomodating container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/34] | Powder accommodating container | ||
[2010/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/26] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshino, Masahiro, Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tsuji, Yasuaki, Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakanishi, Tatsuo, Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Brown, George Laurence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Brown, George Laurence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2000/34] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301088.1 | 11.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19990037147 | 16.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3714799 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1030227 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1030227 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1030227 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
G03G15/0874 (EP,US);
G03G15/0855 (EP,US);
G03G15/0865 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0678 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0682 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/14] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälter für Tonerpulver | [2010/03] | English: | Powder toner accomodating container | [2010/03] | French: | Récipient pour poudre de toner | [2010/03] |
Former [2000/34] | Behälter für Pulver | ||
Former [2000/34] | Powder accommodating container | ||
Former [2000/34] | Récipient pour poudre | Examination procedure | 16.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0120281 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 30; figures 5-7 *; | [X]US3921897 (NOYES ANDROUS D, et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [Y]US4984023 (YOSHIDA TATSUYA [JP]) [Y] 1-6,8 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 32; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]JPH09106156 ; | [A]JPH06278740 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09106156 A 19970422 (CANON INC) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06278740 A 19941004 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 7 * abstract * |