EP1031371 - Filtering unit having separately attachable filter cassette and method of filtering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalge Nunc International Corporation 75 Panoramic Creek Drive Rochester New York 14602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Nalge Nunc International Corporation 75 Panoramic Creek Drive Rochester, New York 14602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leoncavallo, Richard A. 45 Monroe Avenue Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | 02 /
Giverc, Mark 2199 Magog Road Palmyra, New York 14522 / US | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301209.3 | 16.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | US19990255201 | 22.02.1999 Original published format: US 255201 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031371 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031371 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/18, B01D63/08, B01D29/05 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B01D63/087 (EP,US);
B01D29/05 (EP,US);
B01D29/085 (EP);
B01D29/58 (EP);
B01D61/18 (EP,US);
B01D63/082 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/05, B01D29/085, B01D29/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Filtereinheit mit einer getrennt anschliessbaren Filterkassette und Filtrationsverfahren | [2000/35] | English: | Filtering unit having separately attachable filter cassette and method of filtering | [2000/35] | French: | Unité de filtrage avec cassette filtrante capable d'étre fixée libérable et procédé de filtrage | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Request for further processing for: | 27.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0223323 (SYBRON CORP [US]) [X] 1,13,25 * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 16; figure 2 *; | [X]DE3711735 (ANTLINGER H WITEG GLASGERAETE) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,13-18,25,26 * column 3, lines 16-65; figure 2 *; | [X]US5221483 (GLENN STEPHAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,13,15-19,21,25-29 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 28; figure - *; | [X]WO9636428 (MILLIPORE INVEST HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1,13,25 * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 6; figures 1,3,4B ** page 14, lines 6-18 * |