EP1033891 - Method for transferring data using expanded permanent identifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2013/28] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rollender, Douglas H. 548 Stony Brook Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2013/02] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | ||
Former [2012/51] | Hervouet, Sylvie Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | ||
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/29] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Funnell, Samantha Jane, et al Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/36] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301380.2 | 22.02.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | US19990261735 | 03.03.1999 Original published format: US 261735 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033891 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033891 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/02, // H04W8/06 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/06 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/36] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2001/21] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Datenübertragungsverfahren unter Verwendung einer erweiterten ständigen Kennzeichnung | [2000/36] | English: | Method for transferring data using expanded permanent identifier | [2000/36] | French: | Procédé de transfert de données utilisant un identifiant permanent étendu | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2003 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | [2014/11] |
Former [2014/09] | SE | 17.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9806227 (HIGHWAYMASTER COMM INC [US]) [A] 1,8,18 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 14 * * page 17, line 6 - line 20 * * page 19, line 23 - page 26, line 9 * * page 37, line 7 - page 40, line 16 * |