EP1036618 - Cermet tool and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co. Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-machi Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abukawa, Kohei c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi / JP | [2004/39] |
Former [2000/38] | 01 /
Abukawa, Kohei, NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18 Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku, Nagoya Aichi / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301497.4 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | JP19990051516 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: JP 5151699 | JP20000028245 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000028245 | [2004/39] |
Former [2000/38] | JP19990051516 | 26.02.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1036618 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1036618 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1036618 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, B22F7/06 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
B22F7/06 (EP,US);
C22C29/02 (KR);
B23B27/145 (EP,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B23B2200/242 (EP,US);
B23B2200/245 (EP,US);
B23B2222/16 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F2207/03 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/38] | B23B27/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/14] |
Former [2000/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Cermetwerkzeug und dessen Herstellungsmethode | [2004/39] | English: | Cermet tool and method for manufacturing the same | [2000/38] | French: | Outil cermet et sa méthode de fabrication | [2000/38] |
Former [2000/38] | Cermetwerkzeug uund dessen Herstelungsmethode | Examination procedure | 05.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2005 | Request for further processing for: | 02.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS55150941 ; | [X]US4643620 (FUJII HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 10; figures 5A-C,6A-C; table 1 *; | [X]EP0344421 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 9,10 * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 41; tables 1,2 *; | [X]EP0413227 (INTERATOM [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 27 - line 44; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4406961 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [X] 9,10* page 2, line 63 - page 3, line 35 *; | [X]US5484468 (OESTLUND AKE [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810210), vol. 005, no. 022, Database accession no. (M - 054), & JP55150941 A 19801125 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |