EP1033666 - Workflow server and workflow system control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishihara, Hiroshi 125 Izumi-apato, 2788 Izumi-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 245-0016 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Tetsuya 1001 Raionzu-Gadenhiruzu-Totsuka 2022-1 Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0003 / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Yoshiyuki 507-202 Gurinhaimu, 3-31-52 Nakanoshima, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 214-0012 / JP | 04 /
Yokoyama, Takayuki 2830 Izumi-cho Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 245-0016 / JP | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301524.5 | 25.02.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | JP19990056157 | 03.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5615799 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033666 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033666 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/13] |
Former [2000/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Arbeitsfluss-Server und Steuerverfahren für ein Arbeitsfluss-System | [2000/36] | English: | Workflow server and workflow system control method | [2000/36] | French: | Serveur de flux de travail et méthode de contrôle pour un système de flux de travail | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/34] | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0774725 (DUN & BRADSTREET SOFTWARE SERV [US]) [X] 1,9 * page 3, line 24 - page 8, line 58 * * page 45, line 37 - page 58, line 48; figures 1A,1I * [Y] 2-8,2-8; | [Y]JPH08287162 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08287162 A 19961101 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 2-8 * the whole document * |