EP1035562 - Apparatus for cleaning electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foederl, Frank X. 35 Mercier Place Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | 02 /
Lomax, Carson Ray 127 Orville Drive High Point, North Carolina 27260 / US | 03 /
Sunderland, David Cutlar 1304 Dogwood Street Burlington, North Carolina 27217 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 00301549.2 | 28.02.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | US19990266461 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 266461 | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1035562 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C11D7/5018 (EP,US);
B08B3/102 (EP,US);
H05K3/26 (EP,US);
C11D2111/22 (EP,US);
C11D7/263 (EP,US);
C11D7/266 (EP,US);
C11D7/28 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0743 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0746 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0766 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0783 (EP,US);
H05K2203/088 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1518 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von elektronischen Bauteilen | [2000/37] | English: | Apparatus for cleaning electronic components | [2000/37] | French: | Dispositif pour nettoyer les composants électroniques | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |