EP1038760 - Motor vehicle assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2001/06] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Rover Group Limited International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park Warwick CV34 6RG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mellor, Michael 139 Coventry Road Coleshill, Birmingham B46 3EX / GB | 02 /
Pitchford, Neil John The Old Forge, 17 St. Nicholas Church Street Warwick CV34 4JD / GB | 03 /
Hirons, Garry 16 Byron Road Tamworth, Staffordshire B79 8HX / GB | 04 /
Perks, John 2 Tudor Close, New Oscott Sutton Coldfield, West Midlands B73 6SX / GB | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Schernhammer, Herbert, et al Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-5 80788 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Schernhammer, Herbert, et al Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3 80788 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00301886.8 | 08.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | GB19990006903 | 26.03.1999 Original published format: GB 9906903 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1038760 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1038760 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/14, B62D27/02 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
B62D27/026 (EP);
B62D25/14 (EP);
B62D65/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugaufbau | [2000/39] | English: | Motor vehicle assembly | [2000/39] | French: | Ensemble d'un véhicule automobile | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3315646 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,9 * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 4 * * figures 1,9 *; | [A]US5823602 (KELMAN JOSH [US], et al) [A] 1,5* figure 4 * |